NY A04448 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-12 - signed chap.284
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to New York bred and/or wholly owned harness races.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to New York bred and/or wholly owned harness races.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Racing And Wagering Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-12Senatesigned chap.284
2017-08-31Assemblydelivered to governor
2017-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.198
2017-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S999A
2017-06-08SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2017-06-08Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-06-08Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-07Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.98
2017-06-07Assemblyrules report cal.98
2017-06-07Assemblyreported
2017-06-06Assemblyreported referred to rules
2017-06-01Assemblyprint number 4448a
2017-06-01Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to racing and wagering
2017-02-02Assemblyreferred to racing and wagering

Same As/Similar To

S00999 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4448A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04448&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04448&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04448
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04448&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04448A
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04448&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04448&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04448&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A4448#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback