NY A04440 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - print number 4440b
Pending: Assembly Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - print number 4440b
Pending: Assembly Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to access to the central register for child abuse and maltreatment; expands the definition of "provider agency" to include child care and school-based programs for children ages three through five regulated by the health code of the city of New York and temporary employment agencies and educational and training institutions providing child care staff; clarifies the definition of "licensing agency" to include the department of health and mental hygiene of the city of New York, when such department receives an application for a permit to provide child care or receives a notice of a school based program for children ages three through five.
Title
Relates to access to the central register for child abuse and maltreatment; expands the definition of "provider agency" to include child care and school-based programs for children ages three through five regulated by the health code of the city of New York and temporary employment agencies and educational and training institutions providing child care staff; clarifies the definition of "licensing agency" to include the department of health and mental hygiene of the city of New York, when such department receives an application for a permit to provide child care or receives a notice of a school based program for children ages three through five.
Sponsors
Asm. Michele Titus [D] | Asm. Vivian Cook [D] | Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D] | Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D] |
Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] | Asm. John McDonald [D] | Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Assembly | print number 4440b |
2018-03-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to children and families |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2017-07-10 | Assembly | print number 4440a |
2017-07-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to children and families |
2017-02-02 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S07897 (Same As) 2018-03-07 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES