NY A04439 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-01 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-01 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the naming of buildings after public officials.
Title
Prohibits the naming of buildings after public officials.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.764 |
2016-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2015-02-02 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S03118 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS