NY A04438 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-26 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to funding for services of the office of addiction services and supports.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to funding for services of the office of addiction services and supports.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-26Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2024-02-13Assemblyprint number 4438a
2024-02-13Assemblyamend and recommit to alcoholism and drug abuse
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to alcoholism and drug abuse
2023-02-14Assemblyreferred to alcoholism and drug abuse

Same As/Similar To

S05371 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE USE DISORDERS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback