NY A04438 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.167
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.167
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes hazard vehicles designed for the towing or pushing of disabled vehicles to display amber and blue lights for rear projection when such vehicles are engaged in a hazardous operation.
Title
Authorizes hazard vehicles designed for the towing or pushing of disabled vehicles to display amber and blue lights for rear projection when such vehicles are engaged in a hazardous operation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 103 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.167 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-03-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.140 |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S00080 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION