NY A04420 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - held for consideration in labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - held for consideration in labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring the department of labor to collect and report certain information regarding requests from the governor or his or her authorized agent for federal Title XII advances for the state unemployment trust fund.
Title
Relates to requiring the department of labor to collect and report certain information regarding requests from the governor or his or her authorized agent for federal Title XII advances for the state unemployment trust fund.
Sponsors
Asm. Edward Ra [R] | Asm. Jodi Giglio [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Assembly | held for consideration in labor |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S08306 (Same As) 2022-02-10 - REFERRED TO LABOR