NY A04420 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.265
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.265
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the length of time to pay delinquent taxes in installments to thirty-six months.
Title
Expands the length of time to pay delinquent taxes in installments to thirty-six months.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Senate | signed chap.265 |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-12 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-12 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1317 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4585 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.343 |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S04585 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - signed chap.265