NY A04419 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - held for consideration in economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - held for consideration in economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the New York first--shop local program.
Title
Establishes the New York first--shop local program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Assembly | held for consideration in economic development |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S08406 (Same As) 2022-02-23 - REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS