NY A04408 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-24 - substituted by s5723
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-24 - substituted by s5723
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to certain payments to the horsemen's organization; extends such provision to 2022.
Title
Relates to certain payments to the horsemen's organization; extends such provision to 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Racing And Wagering Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Racing And Wagering Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Assembly | substituted by s5723 |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.93 |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-02-11 | Assembly | reference changed to racing and wagering |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05723 (Same As) 2021-07-01 - SIGNED CHAP.216