NY A04388 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-2)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - advanced to third reading cal.416
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - advanced to third reading cal.416
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits an employer or educational institution from requesting or requiring that an employee, applicant or student disclose any user name, password, or other means for accessing a personal account or service through specified electronic communications devices.
Title
Prohibits an employer or educational institution from requesting or requiring that an employee, applicant or student disclose any user name, password, or other means for accessing a personal account or service through specified electronic communications devices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.416 |
2016-03-01 | Assembly | reported |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.307 |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | reported |
2015-03-03 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-01-30 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S06871 (Same As) 2016-03-02 - REFERRED TO LABOR