NY A04359 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the deposit, into the dedicated highway and bridge trust fund, of a portion of the sales tax collected on each gallon of motor fuel sold at retail.
Title
Requires the deposit, into the dedicated highway and bridge trust fund, of a portion of the sales tax collected on each gallon of motor fuel sold at retail.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Assembly | held for consideration in ways and means |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | print number 4359a |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2015-01-30 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |