NY A04357 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - signed chap.38
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - signed chap.38
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits county committees to amend their rules to permit committee members whose terms are expiring in 2021 to remain in their office for an additional one-year term.
Title
Permits county committees to amend their rules to permit committee members whose terms are expiring in 2021 to remain in their office for an additional one-year term.
Sponsors
Asm. Gina Sillitti [D] | Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
Asm. Judy Griffin [D] | Asm. Albert Stirpe [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-16 | Assembly | signed chap.38 |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-02-10 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-10 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.315 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4382 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.18 |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.18 |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | reported |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-02-03 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S04382 (Same As) 2021-02-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4357