NY A04354 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-26 - advanced to third reading cal.763
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to advanced metering infrastructure devices for residential services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to advanced metering infrastructure devices for residential services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-26Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.763
2016-05-24Assemblyreported
2016-05-04Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2016-04-28Assemblyprint number 4354a
2016-04-28Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to energy
2016-01-06Assemblyreferred to energy
2015-01-30Assemblyreferred to energy

Same As/Similar To

S05083 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback