NY A04342 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - held for consideration in election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - held for consideration in election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the ballots of deceased military personnel shall be counted toward the election for which they were cast.
Title
Provides that the ballots of deceased military personnel shall be counted toward the election for which they were cast.
Sponsors
Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Assembly | held for consideration in election law |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2017-02-02 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S00944 (Same As) 2018-05-15 - referred to election law