NY A04339 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-30 - held for consideration in labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-30 - held for consideration in labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a training wage equal to eighty-five percent of the state minimum wage or one hundred percent of the federal minimum wage, whichever is greater, that may be paid to a youth who has no prior job experience; provides that no youth may be paid a training wage for more than one hundred eighty days.
Title
Establishes a training wage equal to eighty-five percent of the state minimum wage or one hundred percent of the federal minimum wage, whichever is greater, that may be paid to a youth who has no prior job experience; provides that no youth may be paid a training wage for more than one hundred eighty days.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Assembly | held for consideration in labor |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2017-02-02 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S07629 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - REFERRED TO LABOR