NY A04335 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-08 - starred on calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-08 - starred on calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes warrant execution (not issuance), following a judgment for the petitioner in summary proceeding to recover possession of real property, the act which cancels the agreement under which the person removed held the premises and annuls the landlord-tenant relationship; provides court not deprived of the power to vacate such warrant at any time (current law provides the court is not deprived of the power to vacate such warrant for good cause shown prior to warrant execution); provides petitioner may recover by action the reasonable value for the use and occupation to the time when the warrant was executed (rather than issued).
Title
Makes warrant execution (not issuance), following a judgment for the petitioner in summary proceeding to recover possession of real property, the act which cancels the agreement under which the person removed held the premises and annuls the landlord-tenant relationship; provides court not deprived of the power to vacate such warrant at any time (current law provides the court is not deprived of the power to vacate such warrant for good cause shown prior to warrant execution); provides petitioner may recover by action the reasonable value for the use and occupation to the time when the warrant was executed (rather than issued).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Assembly | starred on calendar |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.328 |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.416 |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2017-02-02 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S03192 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT