NY A04329 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the value of rent subsidies included as a part of preventive services from an amount not to exceed three hundred dollars per month to an amount not to exceed six hundred dollars per month.
Title
Increases the value of rent subsidies included as a part of preventive services from an amount not to exceed three hundred dollars per month to an amount not to exceed six hundred dollars per month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | print number 4329a |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to children and families |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | referred to children and families |