NY A04328 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - approval memo.96
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - approval memo.96
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the designation of geologically significant areas, territories and sites throughout the state, and for the establishment of a state geological trail.
Title
Provides for the designation of geologically significant areas, territories and sites throughout the state, and for the establishment of a state geological trail.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-22 | Assembly | approval memo.96 |
2021-12-22 | Assembly | signed chap.728 |
2021-12-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-07 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-07 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1509 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7071 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.309 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.309 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | print number 4328a |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2021-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S07071 (Same As) 2021-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4328A