NY A04323 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to mandatory training curriculum for poll workers; requires the state board of elections to develop and provide to each county materials for a model poll worker training program which the counties may use to train individuals to serve as poll workers in state and county elections.
Title
Relates to mandatory training curriculum for poll workers; requires the state board of elections to develop and provide to each county materials for a model poll worker training program which the counties may use to train individuals to serve as poll workers in state and county elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | print number 4323a |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to election law |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S05800 (Same As) 2022-05-17 - referred to ways and means