NY A04322 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.327
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.327
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs contracting state agencies to develop a growth plan in order to increase participation of minority- and women-owned businesses with respect to state contracts and subcontracts.
Title
Directs contracting state agencies to develop a growth plan in order to increase participation of minority- and women-owned businesses with respect to state contracts and subcontracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.327 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.415 |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-02-02 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S03806 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO FINANCE