NY A04319 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-29 - signed chap.806
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-29 - signed chap.806
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the right of a defendant who has entered a plea of not guilty to an information which charges a misdemeanor to a jury trial.
Title
Relates to the right of a defendant who has entered a plea of not guilty to an information which charges a misdemeanor to a jury trial.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-29 | Assembly | signed chap.806 |
2021-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-05-24 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-24 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.101 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S689 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.145 |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S00689 (Same As) 2021-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4319