NY A04301 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-26 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-26 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring the governor submit in person to oral questions from the legislature for two hours on an annual basis.
Title
Relates to requiring the governor submit in person to oral questions from the legislature for two hours on an annual basis.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-26 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2024-01-08 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2023-02-15 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |