NY A04297 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-23 - substituted by s2912
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-23 - substituted by s2912
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the village of Saranac Lake to grant easements over certain park lands for the purpose of operating a waterworks system.
Title
Authorizes the village of Saranac Lake to grant easements over certain park lands for the purpose of operating a waterworks system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-23 | Assembly | substituted by s2912 |
2011-05-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.385 |
2011-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2011-04-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-02-03 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S02912 (Same As) 2011-06-08 - SIGNED CHAP.64