NY A04294 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-24 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-24 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
This bill amends the Civil Service Law, making it an improper employer practice for a county legislature to reject an agreement negotiated by the authorized community college employer and the employee organization representing the community college when such agreement can be implemented within such allocated funds.
Title
An act to amend the civil service law, in relation to improper employer practices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 126 N: 18 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-24 | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS | |
2010-02-24 | delivered to senate | |
2010-02-24 | passed assembly | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.322 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-04-01 | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS | |
2009-04-01 | delivered to senate | |
2009-04-01 | passed assembly | |
2009-02-26 | advanced to third reading cal.163 | |
2009-02-24 | reported | |
2009-02-03 | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S3165 (Same As) 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS