NY A04289 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - signed chap.179
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides a safe harbor exemption to commercial fishing vessels in certain emergency situations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides a safe harbor exemption to commercial fishing vessels in certain emergency situations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-21Senatesigned chap.179
2017-08-09Assemblydelivered to governor
2017-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.2026
2017-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4051C
2017-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2017-06-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-15Assemblyamended on third reading 4289c
2017-06-15Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.329
2017-06-15Assemblyrules report cal.329
2017-06-15Assemblyreported
2017-06-13Assemblyamend and recommit to rules 4289b
2017-06-07Assemblyreported referred to rules
2017-05-04Assemblyprint number 4289a
2017-05-04Assemblyamend and recommit to environmental conservation
2017-02-02Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S04051 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4289C

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04289&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04289&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04289
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04289&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04289A
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04289&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04289B
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04289&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04289C
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04289&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04289&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04289&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A4289#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback