NY A04286 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a gift for eliminating the stigma relating to mental illness on personal income tax returns; establishes the mental illness anti-stigma fund into which such gifts shall be deposited; directs the monies in such fund be used by the office of mental health to provide grants to organizations dedicated to eliminating the stigma attached to mental illness and those with mental health needs.
Title
Establishes a gift for eliminating the stigma relating to mental illness on personal income tax returns; establishes the mental illness anti-stigma fund into which such gifts shall be deposited; directs the monies in such fund be used by the office of mental health to provide grants to organizations dedicated to eliminating the stigma attached to mental illness and those with mental health needs.
Sponsors
Asm. Peter Rivera [D] | Asm. Naomi Rivera [D] | Asm. Matthew Titone [D] | Asm. Joseph Saladino [R] |
Asm. Eric Stevenson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-04 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | held for consideration in ways and means |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2011-02-02 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |