NY A04283 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 77-17)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - substituted by s1130
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the sale of dogs, cats and rabbits by retail pet shops; authorizes collaboration with entities to provide space to showcase cats or dogs owned by certain entities for the purpose of adoption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the sale of dogs, cats and rabbits by retail pet shops; authorizes collaboration with entities to provide space to showcase cats or dogs owned by certain entities for the purpose of adoption.

Sponsors

Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]Asm. Brian Barnwell [D]Asm. Harvey Epstein [D]Asm. Catalina Cruz [D]
Asm. Pamela Hunter [D]Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]Asm. Deborah Glick [D]Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]
Asm. Nathalia Fernandez [D]Asm. Amy Paulin [D]Asm. Charles Lavine [D]Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]
Asm. Ron Kim [D]Asm. Monica Wallace [D]Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D]Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]
Asm. Inez Dickens [D]Asm. Michael Benedetto [D]Asm. William Colton [D]Asm. Colin Schmitt [R]
Asm. David Weprin [D]Asm. Dan Quart [D]Asm. Steven Englebright [D]Asm. Mathylde Frontus [D]
Asm. Steven Otis [D]Asm. Harry Bronson [D]Asm. Karines Reyes [D]Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D]
Asm. Philip Ramos [D]Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte Hermelyn [D]Asm. Emily Gallagher [D]Asm. Khaleel Anderson [D]
Asm. Anna Kelles [D]Asm. Jessica Gonzalez-Rojas [D]Asm. Patrick Burke [D]Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D]
Asm. Phara Souffrant Forrest [D]Asm. Christopher Burdick [D]Asm. Kenneth Burgos [D]Asm. John McDonald [D]
Asm. Sarah Clark [D]Asm. Jose Rivera [D]Asm. Jaime Williams [D]Asm. Stefani Zinerman [D]
Asm. David McDonough [R]Asm. Marcela Mitaynes [D]Asm. Zohran Kwame Mamdani [D]Asm. Chantel Jackson [D]
Asm. Jennifer Lunsford [D]Asm. Maritza Davila [D]Asm. Edward Ra [R]Asm. Melissa Miller [R]
Asm. Keith Brown [R]Asm. Jarett Gandolfo [R]Asm. Jonathan Rivera [D]Asm. William Conrad [D]
Asm. Robert Carroll [D]Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]Asm. Karen McMahon [D]Asm. Kevin Byrne [R]
Asm. Angelo Morinello [R]Asm. Michael Reilly [R]Asm. Gina Sillitti [D]Asm. Michael Tannousis [R]
Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D]Asm. Peter Abbate [D]Asm. Phillip Steck [D]Asm. Josh Jensen [R]
Asm. Michael Durso [R]Asm. John Mikulin [R]Asm. Manny De Los Santos [D]Asm. Charles Fall [D]
Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D]Asm. Brian Cunningham [D]Asm. Eddie Gibbs [D]Asm. Daniel Rosenthal [D]
Asm. Taylor Darling [D]Asm. Alfred Taylor [D]Asm. Christopher Tague [R]Asm. Michael Cusick [D]
Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]Asm. Steve Stern [D]Asm. Nikki Lucas [D]Asm. Edward Braunstein [D]
Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D]Asm. Sandra Galef [D]Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R]Asm. Latrice Walker [D]
Asm. Demond Meeks [D]Asm. Brian Miller [R]Asm. Karl Brabenec [R]Asm. Vivian Cook [D]
Asm. Jo Simon [D]Asm. Fred Thiele [D]

Roll Calls

2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-23Assemblysubstituted by s1130
2022-05-23Assemblyrules report cal.296
2022-05-23Assemblyreported
2022-05-10Assemblyreported referred to rules
2022-01-05Assemblyreferred to codes
2021-05-25Assemblyreported referred to rules
2021-04-27Assemblyreported referred to codes
2021-02-01Assemblyreferred to agriculture

Same As/Similar To

S01130 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - returned to senate

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A4283
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04283&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04283
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04283&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04283&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04283&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04283&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC4

Bill Comments

feedback