NY A04280 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits public utilities from requiring the posting of deposits or prepayment of charges by residential customers as a condition of providing service; requires the return of all deposits and prepayments by September 1, 2011.
Title
Prohibits public utilities from requiring the posting of deposits or prepayment of charges by residential customers as a condition of providing service; requires the return of all deposits and prepayments by September 1, 2011.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-04 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2012-05-15 | Assembly | held for consideration in corporations, authorities and commissions |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2011-02-02 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |