NY A04277 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires notaries public and commissioners of deeds to complete and retain certain documents relating to the transfer of residential real property.
Title
Requires notaries public and commissioners of deeds to complete and retain certain documents relating to the transfer of residential real property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 114 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-03-31 | Assembly | amended on third reading 4277a |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.145 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.549 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.549 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S04292 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO FINANCE