NY A04275 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - REFERRED TO AGING
Pending: Senate Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes and directs the department of health and the office for the aging to conduct a study of fees and charges assessed to residents of assisted living facilities and to make recommendations to the legislature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes and directs the department of health and the office for the aging to conduct a study of fees and charges assessed to residents of assisted living facilities and to make recommendations to the legislature.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Aging Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02SenateREFERRED TO AGING
2019-04-02Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-04-02Assemblypassed assembly
2019-03-21Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.156
2019-03-19Assemblyreported
2019-02-01Assemblyreferred to aging

Same As/Similar To

S03066 (Same As) 2019-02-01 - REFERRED TO AGING

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback