NY A04275 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits health insurers providing prescription drug coverage from reducing reimbursement, imposing a higher deductible or imposing a higher co-payment for 3 month supplies of drugs to treat or alleviate a chronic illness or condition.
Title
Prohibits health insurers providing prescription drug coverage from reducing reimbursement, imposing a higher deductible or imposing a higher co-payment for 3 month supplies of drugs to treat or alleviate a chronic illness or condition.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-04 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2012-06-06 | Assembly | held for consideration in insurance |
2012-05-15 | Assembly | reference changed to insurance |
2012-05-03 | Assembly | print number 4275a |
2012-05-03 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to health |
2011-02-02 | Assembly | referred to health |