NY A04272 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a volunteer firefighter scholarship program; rewards volunteer firefighters who respond to twenty-five percent of emergency calls for eight years with a student loan award equal to four times the SUNY tuition rate; makes an appropriation therefor.
Title
Creates a volunteer firefighter scholarship program; rewards volunteer firefighters who respond to twenty-five percent of emergency calls for eight years with a student loan award equal to four times the SUNY tuition rate; makes an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Asm. Michael Norris [R] | Asm. Brian Miller [R] | Asm. Christopher Tague [R] | Asm. Josh Jensen [R] |
Asm. Karl Brabenec [R] | Asm. Angelo Morinello [R] | Asm. Carrie Woerner [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | motion to discharge lost |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S03656 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO FINANCE