NY A04267 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for the termination of a residential lease by a victim of domestic violence; further provides for the lease termination procedure; allows the tenants to pay rent, pro-rata, up to the lease termination date; imposes a civil penalty; makes related provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the termination of a residential lease by a victim of domestic violence; further provides for the lease termination procedure; allows the tenants to pay rent, pro-rata, up to the lease termination date; imposes a civil penalty; makes related provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2019-05-14Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-14Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-09Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.293
2019-05-07Assemblyreported
2019-04-30Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-02-01Assemblyreferred to housing

Same As/Similar To

S04281 (Same As) 2019-03-06 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback