NY A04267 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for the termination of a residential lease by a victim of domestic violence; further provides for the lease termination procedure; allows the tenants to pay rent, pro-rata, up to the lease termination date; imposes a civil penalty; makes related provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the termination of a residential lease by a victim of domestic violence; further provides for the lease termination procedure; allows the tenants to pay rent, pro-rata, up to the lease termination date; imposes a civil penalty; makes related provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.1063
2019-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4281A
2019-06-17SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-17Senatereturned to senate
2019-06-17Assemblyrepassed assembly
2019-06-13Assemblyamended on third reading 4267a
2019-06-13Assemblyvote reconsidered - restored to third reading
2019-06-13AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-13Senaterecalled from senate
2019-05-14SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2019-05-14Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-14Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-09Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.293
2019-05-07Assemblyreported
2019-04-30Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-02-01Assemblyreferred to housing

Same As/Similar To

S04281 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4267A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04267&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04267&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04267
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04267&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04267A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04267&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04267&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04267&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A4267#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback