NY A04265 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the phase-out on varying time schedules of state use of various categories of pesticides on state property; provides that it does not apply to certain antimicrobial pesticides; requires the department of environmental conservation to adopt a pest management plan for every state department, agency, and public benefit corporation; provides for waivers and exemptions.
Title
Provides for the phase-out on varying time schedules of state use of various categories of pesticides on state property; provides that it does not apply to certain antimicrobial pesticides; requires the department of environmental conservation to adopt a pest management plan for every state department, agency, and public benefit corporation; provides for waivers and exemptions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-15 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2017-02-02 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S00154 (Same As) 2017-01-04 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
S07081 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
S07081 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION