NY A04260 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s2927
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s2927
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides annual payments from the town of Southampton community preservation fund to the East Quogue union free school district.
Title
Provides annual payments from the town of Southampton community preservation fund to the East Quogue union free school district.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s2927 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.520 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.520 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-01-30 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S02927 (Same As) 2015-10-26 - SIGNED CHAP.396