NY A04253 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - approval memo.45
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - approval memo.45
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the empire state development corporation to administer several revolving loan fund (RLF) programs in a manner consistent with how the small business revolving loan fund is administered.
Title
Authorizes the empire state development corporation to administer several revolving loan fund (RLF) programs in a manner consistent with how the small business revolving loan fund is administered.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Small Business Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Small Business Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | Senate | approval memo.45 |
2017-12-18 | Senate | signed chap.474 |
2017-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1293 |
2017-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4046 |
2017-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.340 |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | reported |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-02-02 | Assembly | referred to small business |
Same As/Similar To
S04046 (Same As) 2017-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4253