NY A04239 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-16 - committed to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-16 - committed to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to enhancing criminal investigations and prosecutions in relation to the integrity of statements of those accused of crimes and the integrity of eyewitness identifications.
Title
Relates to enhancing criminal investigations and prosecutions in relation to the integrity of statements of those accused of crimes and the integrity of eyewitness identifications.
Sponsors
Asm. Joseph Lentol [D] | Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Asm. Dan Quart [D] |
Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D] | Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D] | Asm. Nick Perry [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-16 | Assembly | committed to codes |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.321 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-02-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-02-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.56 |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | reported |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-02-01 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S04826 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CODES