NY A04231 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 68-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for findings of the state board of parole necessary for discretionary release of incarcerated persons on parole.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for findings of the state board of parole necessary for discretionary release of incarcerated persons on parole.

Sponsors

Asm. David Weprin [D]Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]Asm. Harvey Epstein [D]Asm. Charles Lavine [D]
Asm. Alfred Taylor [D]Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D]Asm. Daniel Rosenthal [D]Asm. Jo Simon [D]
Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]Asm. Nathalia Fernandez [D]Asm. Robert Carroll [D]Asm. Ron Kim [D]
Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D]Asm. Vivian Cook [D]Asm. Nick Perry [D]Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D]
Asm. Charles Barron [D]Asm. Karines Reyes [D]Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]Asm. Gary Pretlow [D]
Asm. Latrice Walker [D]Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]Asm. Dan Quart [D]Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]
Asm. Pamela Hunter [D]Asm. Catalina Cruz [D]Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]Asm. Inez Dickens [D]
Asm. Mathylde Frontus [D]Asm. Zohran Kwame Mamdani [D]Asm. Jessica Gonzalez-Rojas [D]Asm. Marcela Mitaynes [D]
Asm. Anna Kelles [D]Asm. Christopher Burdick [D]Asm. Khaleel Anderson [D]Asm. Demond Meeks [D]
Asm. Amanda Septimo [D]Asm. Phara Souffrant Forrest [D]Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D]Asm. Kevin Cahill [D]
Asm. Kenneth Burgos [D]Asm. Maritza Davila [D]Asm. Stefani Zinerman [D]Asm. Philip Ramos [D]
Asm. Emily Gallagher [D]Asm. John McDonald [D]Asm. Sarah Clark [D]Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D]
Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte Hermelyn [D]Asm. Nader Sayegh [D]Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D]
Asm. Deborah Glick [D]Asm. Michaelle Solages [D]Asm. Chantel Jackson [D]Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D]
Asm. Taylor Darling [D]Asm. Phillip Steck [D]Asm. Latoya Joyner [D]Asm. Amy Paulin [D]
Asm. Eddie Gibbs [D]Asm. Charles Fall [D]Asm. Harry Bronson [D]Asm. Jose Rivera [D]
Asm. Yudelka Tapia [D]Asm. Brian Cunningham [D]Asm. Steven Englebright [D]Asm. Fred Thiele [D]

Roll Calls

2021-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-05Assemblyreferred to codes
2021-05-25Assemblyprint number 4231a
2021-05-25Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2021-03-09Assemblyreported referred to codes
2021-02-01Assemblyreferred to correction

Same As/Similar To

S01415 (Same As) 2021-11-08 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S07514 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback