NY A04203 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-12)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - committed to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - committed to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the diminution of health insurance benefits of public employee retirees and their dependents or reducing the employer's contributions for such insurance; defines employers to include the state, municipalities, school districts, and public authorities and commissions.
Title
Prohibits the diminution of health insurance benefits of public employee retirees and their dependents or reducing the employer's contributions for such insurance; defines employers to include the state, municipalities, school districts, and public authorities and commissions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | committed to governmental employees |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-01 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S03854 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS