NY A04201 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to veterans' health care; creates a veteran health care review to ensure veterans and their families have access to health and mental health treatment, including for post-traumatic stress disorder, depression, anxiety, military sexual trauma, reproductive and mental health conditions, and suicide prevention.
Title
Relates to veterans' health care; creates a veteran health care review to ensure veterans and their families have access to health and mental health treatment, including for post-traumatic stress disorder, depression, anxiety, military sexual trauma, reproductive and mental health conditions, and suicide prevention.
Sponsors
Asm. Steve Stern [D] | Asm. Matthew Simpson [R] | Asm. Christopher Eachus [D] | Asm. Steven Raga [D] |
Asm. Jenifer Rajkumar [D] | Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D] | Asm. Michael Novakhov [R] | Asm. Lester Chang [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2024-02-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-02-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.116 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2023-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.624 |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.624 |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | print number 4201b |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-05-12 | Assembly | print number 4201a |
2023-05-12 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to veterans' affairs |
2023-02-13 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S07501 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS