NY A04186 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - approval memo.95
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - approval memo.95
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides an online absentee ballot tracking system to allow a voter who has submitted an application for an absentee ballot to track the status of an absentee application and an absentee ballot on the state board or local board website.
Title
Provides an online absentee ballot tracking system to allow a voter who has submitted an application for an absentee ballot to track the status of an absentee application and an absentee ballot on the state board or local board website.
Sponsors
Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Fred Thiele [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] |
Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Brian Barnwell [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-22 | Assembly | approval memo.95 |
2021-12-22 | Assembly | signed chap.727 |
2021-12-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1353 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6395A |
2021-05-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | amended on third reading 4186b |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.253 |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | reported |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-04-16 | Assembly | print number 4186a |
2021-04-16 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to election law |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S06395 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4186B