NY A04169 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Sets forth the means of the disposition of campaign funds upon the conviction of a felony of a candidate, former candidate or holder of elective office.
Title
Sets forth the means of the disposition of campaign funds upon the conviction of a felony of a candidate, former candidate or holder of elective office.
Sponsors
Asm. Judy Griffin [D] | Asm. Deborah Glick [D] | Asm. Fred Thiele [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
Asm. Steven Englebright [D] | Asm. Karen McMahon [D] | Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | print number 4169b |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | print number 4169a |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S00091 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS