NY A04157 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.115
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to automatic license plate readers (ALPRs) and mandatory postings of policies and annual reporting requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to automatic license plate readers (ALPRs) and mandatory postings of policies and annual reporting requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.115
2024-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2023-03-23SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
2023-03-23Assemblydelivered to senate
2023-03-23Assemblypassed assembly
2023-03-16Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.62
2023-03-15Assemblyreported
2023-02-10Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S03165 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback