NY A04141 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-13)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - print number 4141a
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits cost sharing for insulin; provides that an insured shall not be subject to a deductible, copayment, coinsurance or any other cost sharing requirement for the purchase of insulin.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits cost sharing for insulin; provides that an insured shall not be subject to a deductible, copayment, coinsurance or any other cost sharing requirement for the purchase of insulin.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-25Assemblyprint number 4141a
2024-01-25Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to insurance
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to insurance
2023-02-10Assemblyreferred to insurance

Same As/Similar To

S00504 (Same As) 2024-01-30 - referred to insurance

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback