NY A04140 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on October 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-26 - signed chap.376
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on October 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-26 - signed chap.376
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the scope of practice of nurse practitioners.
Title
Relates to the scope of practice of nurse practitioners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-26 | Senate | signed chap.376 |
2015-10-14 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-11 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2300 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.306 |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | reported |
2015-01-29 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S02300 (Same As) 2015-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4140