NY A04139 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - ordered to third reading rules cal.678
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - ordered to third reading rules cal.678
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the liability of the state to any person who suffers damage as a result of a defect in a state highway.
Title
Relates to the liability of the state to any person who suffers damage as a result of a defect in a state highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.678 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.678 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-03-02 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S03899 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES