NY A04129 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - print number 4129a
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - print number 4129a
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a manufacturer from labeling or advertising a nonwoven disposable product for sale as flushable without prior approval from the department of environmental conservation.
Title
Prohibits a manufacturer from labeling or advertising a nonwoven disposable product for sale as flushable without prior approval from the department of environmental conservation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Assembly | print number 4129a |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S09105 (Same As) 2022-05-09 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION