NY A04129 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on November 20 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-11-20 - delivered to governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for the appointment of the members of the New York state housing finance agency, the housing trust fund corporation and the affordable housing corporation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the appointment of the members of the New York state housing finance agency, the housing trust fund corporation and the affordable housing corporation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-20Assemblydelivered to governor
2020-07-23SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-07-23SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-07-23Senate3RD READING CAL.1015
2020-07-23SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7757A
2020-07-21SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2020-07-21Assemblydelivered to senate
2020-07-21Assemblypassed assembly
2020-02-27Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.423
2020-02-25Assemblyreported
2020-02-20Assemblyprint number 4129a
2020-02-20Assemblyamend and recommit to housing
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to housing
2019-02-01Assemblyreferred to housing

Same As/Similar To

S07757 (Same As) 2020-07-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4129A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback