NY A04112 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-05 - ordered to third reading cal.139
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-05 - ordered to third reading cal.139
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to zone pricing of gasoline.
Title
Relates to zone pricing of gasoline.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 110 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.139 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-05-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.309 |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | reported |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S06255 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION